LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCR48
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SCR48
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SCR48
Compare Versions
SCR48 Chaptered August 20, 2013
SCR48 Enrolled August 16, 2013
SCR48 Amended July 3, 2013
SCR48 Amended June 27, 2013
SCR48 Introduced May 30, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SCR48 Chaptered August 20, 2013
SCR48 Enrolled August 16, 2013
SCR48 Amended July 3, 2013
SCR48 Amended June 27, 2013
SCR48 Introduced May 30, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare