California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR48 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill May 30, 2013

Enrolled

Bill August 16, 2013

Chaptered

Bill August 20, 2013

Amended

Bill July 3, 2013
Bill June 27, 2013