Senate | 08/28/2014 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 134, Statutes of 2014. | ||
Senate | 08/28/2014 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 9:15 a.m. | ||
Senate | 08/21/2014 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 4683.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/19/2014 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 08/19/2014 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6158.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/18/2014 | Amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 08/14/2014 | From committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 12). | ||
Assembly | 06/26/2014 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2014 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 06/05/2014 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 3755.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2014 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2014 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2014 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2014 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |