California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SJR23 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill April 10, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2014

Chaptered

Bill August 28, 2014

Amended

Bill August 18, 2014
Bill May 22, 2014