LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SJR23
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SJR23
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SJR23
Compare Versions
SJR23 Chaptered August 28, 2014
SJR23 Enrolled August 25, 2014
SJR23 Amended August 18, 2014
SJR23 Amended May 22, 2014
SJR23 Introduced April 10, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SJR23 Chaptered August 28, 2014
SJR23 Enrolled August 25, 2014
SJR23 Amended August 18, 2014
SJR23 Amended May 22, 2014
SJR23 Introduced April 10, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare