|
08/17/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 222, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 2. Page 2419.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 3. Page 1903.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/07/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2015
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 1475.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1374.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (April 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2015
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2015
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|