LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1245
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1245
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1245
Compare Versions
AB1245 Chaptered August 17, 2015
AB1245 Enrolled July 21, 2015
AB1245 Amended July 7, 2015
AB1245 Amended May 11, 2015
AB1245 Amended April 6, 2015
AB1245 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB1245 Chaptered August 17, 2015
AB1245 Enrolled July 21, 2015
AB1245 Amended July 7, 2015
AB1245 Amended May 11, 2015
AB1245 Amended April 6, 2015
AB1245 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare