California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1245 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill July 21, 2015

Chaptered

Bill August 17, 2015

Amended

Bill July 7, 2015
Bill May 11, 2015
Bill April 6, 2015