|
07/14/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 94, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2015
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1614.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2015
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1388.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D., & E. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and J., E.D., & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2015
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|