California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1270 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill June 29, 2015

Chaptered

Bill July 14, 2015

Amended

Bill April 6, 2015
Bill March 24, 2015