LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1270
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1270
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1270
Compare Versions
AB1270 Chaptered July 14, 2015
AB1270 Enrolled June 29, 2015
AB1270 Amended April 6, 2015
AB1270 Amended March 24, 2015
AB1270 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB1270 Chaptered July 14, 2015
AB1270 Enrolled June 29, 2015
AB1270 Amended April 6, 2015
AB1270 Amended March 24, 2015
AB1270 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare