|
07/25/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 91, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
07/25/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4644.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2016
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/28/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3524.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/19/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/15/2016
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. (Page 3426.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/14/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/13/2016
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/12/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (January 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/05/2016
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 5). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/04/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2015
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|