California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1272 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill July 7, 2016

Chaptered

Bill July 25, 2016

Amended

Bill January 13, 2016
Bill January 4, 2016
Bill April 16, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015