California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1272 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 07/25/2016

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1272CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 91 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE JULY 25, 2016 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR JULY 25, 2016 PASSED THE SENATE JUNE 30, 2016 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY JANUARY 28, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JANUARY 13, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JANUARY 4, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 16, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 26, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Grove FEBRUARY 27, 2015 An act to amend Section 1048.1 of the Penal Code, relating to crimes. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1272, Grove. Criminal procedure: trial schedule conflicts. Existing law requires a superior court to make reasonable efforts to avoid setting a trial for murder, sexual assault, child abuse, or a case being handled in the Career Criminal Prosecution Program on the same day that another case is set for trial involving the same prosecuting attorney. This bill would expand this requirement to include a trial involving an alleged offense against a person with a developmental disability. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 1048.1 of the Penal Code is amended to read: 1048.1. (a) In scheduling a trial date at an arraignment in superior court involving any of the following offenses, reasonable efforts shall be made to avoid setting that trial, when that case is assigned to a particular prosecuting attorney, on the same day that another case is set for trial involving the same prosecuting attorney: (1) Murder, as defined in subdivision (a) of Section 187. (2) An alleged sexual assault offense, as described in subdivisions (a) and (b) of Section 11165.1. (3) An alleged child abuse offense, as described in Section 11165.6. (4) A case being handled in the Career Criminal Prosecution Program pursuant to Chapter 2.2 (commencing with Section 999b). (5) An alleged offense against a person with a developmental disability. (b) For purposes of this section, "developmental disability" has the same meaning as found in Section 4512 of the Welfare and Institutions Code.