|
09/12/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 287, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2016
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 6122.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 19 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2016
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5059.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2016
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2015
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2015
|
From Consent Calendar. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hill.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1453.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2015
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|