California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1282 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 12, 2016

Amended

Bill August 8, 2016
Bill September 1, 2015