LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1282
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1282
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1282
Compare Versions
AB1282 Chaptered September 12, 2016
AB1282 Enrolled August 25, 2016
AB1282 Amended August 8, 2016
AB1282 Amended September 1, 2015
AB1282 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB1282 Chaptered September 12, 2016
AB1282 Enrolled August 25, 2016
AB1282 Amended August 8, 2016
AB1282 Amended September 1, 2015
AB1282 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare