|
09/28/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 740, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 70. Noes 4. Page 6529.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5299.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2016
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2016
|
Re-referred to Coms. on E., U., & C. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 1727.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2015
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|