California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1289 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill August 2, 2016
Bill June 21, 2016
Bill September 3, 2015
Bill April 16, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015