LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1289
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1289
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1289
Compare Versions
AB1289 Chaptered September 28, 2016
AB1289 Enrolled September 2, 2016
AB1289 Amended August 19, 2016
AB1289 Amended August 2, 2016
AB1289 Amended June 21, 2016
AB1289 Amended September 3, 2015
AB1289 Amended April 16, 2015
AB1289 Amended March 26, 2015
AB1289 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB1289 Chaptered September 28, 2016
AB1289 Enrolled September 2, 2016
AB1289 Amended August 19, 2016
AB1289 Amended August 2, 2016
AB1289 Amended June 21, 2016
AB1289 Amended September 3, 2015
AB1289 Amended April 16, 2015
AB1289 Amended March 26, 2015
AB1289 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare