Assembly
|
08/31/2016
|
Assembly refused to concur in Senate amendments. (Ayes 31. Noes 21. Page 6600.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 9. Page 5519.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2015
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2015
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 1. Page 1839.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1624.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 2.) (May 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2015
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2015
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|