LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1306
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1306
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1306
Compare Versions
AB1306 Amended June 30, 2016
AB1306 Amended June 20, 2016
AB1306 Amended July 1, 2015
AB1306 Amended May 28, 2015
AB1306 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB1306 Amended June 30, 2016
AB1306 Amended June 20, 2016
AB1306 Amended July 1, 2015
AB1306 Amended May 28, 2015
AB1306 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare