California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1306 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Amended

Bill June 30, 2016
Bill June 20, 2016
Bill July 1, 2015
Bill May 28, 2015