|
01/15/2016
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2015
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/17/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 2947.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 6 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 2505.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/14/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/07/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2015
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 23. Page 1881.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2015
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|