LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1354
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1354
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1354
Compare Versions
AB1354 Enrolled September 10, 2015
AB1354 Amended September 2, 2015
AB1354 Amended August 31, 2015
AB1354 Amended July 7, 2015
AB1354 Amended June 1, 2015
AB1354 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB1354 Enrolled September 10, 2015
AB1354 Amended September 2, 2015
AB1354 Amended August 31, 2015
AB1354 Amended July 7, 2015
AB1354 Amended June 1, 2015
AB1354 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare