California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1354 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2015

Amended

Bill September 2, 2015
Bill August 31, 2015
Bill July 7, 2015
Bill June 1, 2015