|
09/16/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 374, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/16/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6052.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5023.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 21).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3510.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/21/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 21). Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/15/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (January 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/14/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/13/2016
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/12/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (January 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/07/2016
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 3367.) (pending re-refer to Com. on JUD.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/06/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/05/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/04/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2015
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2015
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Coms. on B. & P. and JUD. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2015
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|