LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1386
Draft Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1386
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1386
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
February 27, 2015
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
August 23, 2016
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
September 16, 2016
Compare
Amended
Bill
June 28, 2016
Compare
Bill
June 13, 2016
Compare
Bill
May 31, 2016
Compare
Bill
January 13, 2016
Compare
Bill
January 5, 2016
Compare
Bill
January 4, 2016
Compare
Bill
April 16, 2015
Compare
Bill
March 26, 2015
Compare