LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1386
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1386
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1386
Compare Versions
AB1386 Chaptered September 16, 2016
AB1386 Enrolled August 23, 2016
AB1386 Amended June 28, 2016
AB1386 Amended June 13, 2016
AB1386 Amended May 31, 2016
AB1386 Amended January 13, 2016
AB1386 Amended January 5, 2016
AB1386 Amended January 4, 2016
AB1386 Amended April 16, 2015
AB1386 Amended March 26, 2015
AB1386 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB1386 Chaptered September 16, 2016
AB1386 Enrolled August 23, 2016
AB1386 Amended June 28, 2016
AB1386 Amended June 13, 2016
AB1386 Amended May 31, 2016
AB1386 Amended January 13, 2016
AB1386 Amended January 5, 2016
AB1386 Amended January 4, 2016
AB1386 Amended April 16, 2015
AB1386 Amended March 26, 2015
AB1386 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare