Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
From Senate committee without further action.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2016
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/14/2015
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 5. Page 1839.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1685.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2015
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2015
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2015
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2015
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|