California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1400 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Amended

Bill June 20, 2016
Bill July 6, 2015
Bill June 1, 2015
Bill May 6, 2015
Bill April 21, 2015