LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1400
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1400
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1400
Compare Versions
AB1400 Amended June 20, 2016
AB1400 Amended July 6, 2015
AB1400 Amended June 1, 2015
AB1400 Amended May 6, 2015
AB1400 Amended April 21, 2015
AB1400 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB1400 Amended June 20, 2016
AB1400 Amended July 6, 2015
AB1400 Amended June 1, 2015
AB1400 Amended May 6, 2015
AB1400 Amended April 21, 2015
AB1400 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare