|
07/06/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 49, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 2082.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1491.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 9).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1346.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/02/2015
|
Referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/16/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 15.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/15/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|