LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB149
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB149
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB149
Compare Versions
AB149 Chaptered July 6, 2015
AB149 Enrolled June 23, 2015
AB149 Amended June 11, 2015
AB149 Amended April 29, 2015
AB149 Introduced January 15, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB149 Chaptered July 6, 2015
AB149 Enrolled June 23, 2015
AB149 Amended June 11, 2015
AB149 Amended April 29, 2015
AB149 Introduced January 15, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare