LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB149
Draft Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB149
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB149
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
January 15, 2015
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
June 23, 2015
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
July 6, 2015
Compare
Amended
Bill
June 11, 2015
Compare
Bill
April 29, 2015
Compare