|
10/02/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 445, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/02/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/18/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2015
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2993.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2015
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (September 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2015
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2412.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 1262.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/05/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 4.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|