LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1506
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1506
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1506
Compare Versions
AB1506 Chaptered October 2, 2015
AB1506 Enrolled September 11, 2015
AB1506 Amended August 31, 2015
AB1506 Amended June 30, 2015
AB1506 Amended June 15, 2015
AB1506 Introduced March 4, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB1506 Chaptered October 2, 2015
AB1506 Enrolled September 11, 2015
AB1506 Amended August 31, 2015
AB1506 Amended June 30, 2015
AB1506 Amended June 15, 2015
AB1506 Introduced March 4, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare