California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1506 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 4, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 2, 2015

Amended

Bill August 31, 2015
Bill June 30, 2015
Bill June 15, 2015