|
07/01/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 41, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 43. Noes 31. Page 5591.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 15. Page 3901.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (May 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 977.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/06/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 5.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/05/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|