California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1511 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 5, 2015

Enrolled

Bill July 1, 2016

Chaptered

Bill July 1, 2016

Amended

Bill May 17, 2016
Bill May 11, 2016
Bill May 4, 2016
Bill May 18, 2015