LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1511
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1511
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1511
Compare Versions
AB1511 Enrolled July 1, 2016
AB1511 Chaptered July 1, 2016
AB1511 Amended May 17, 2016
AB1511 Amended May 11, 2016
AB1511 Amended May 4, 2016
AB1511 Amended May 18, 2015
AB1511 Introduced March 5, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB1511 Enrolled July 1, 2016
AB1511 Chaptered July 1, 2016
AB1511 Amended May 17, 2016
AB1511 Amended May 11, 2016
AB1511 Amended May 4, 2016
AB1511 Amended May 18, 2015
AB1511 Introduced March 5, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare