|
07/14/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 95, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2142.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1551.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2015
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 10).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 977.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/06/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 5.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/05/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|