LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1512
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1512
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1512
Compare Versions
AB1512 Chaptered July 14, 2015
AB1512 Enrolled June 29, 2015
AB1512 Amended June 1, 2015
AB1512 Amended April 6, 2015
AB1512 Introduced March 5, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB1512 Chaptered July 14, 2015
AB1512 Enrolled June 29, 2015
AB1512 Amended June 1, 2015
AB1512 Amended April 6, 2015
AB1512 Introduced March 5, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare