California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1512 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 5, 2015

Enrolled

Bill June 29, 2015

Chaptered

Bill July 14, 2015

Amended

Bill June 1, 2015
Bill April 6, 2015