|
10/10/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 731, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/18/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 3085.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2612.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 7).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1560.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|