California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1535 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 25, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 14, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 10, 2015

Amended

Bill July 13, 2015
Bill June 30, 2015