LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1535
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1535
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1535
Compare Versions
AB1535 Chaptered October 10, 2015
AB1535 Enrolled September 14, 2015
AB1535 Amended July 13, 2015
AB1535 Amended June 30, 2015
AB1535 Introduced March 25, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB1535 Chaptered October 10, 2015
AB1535 Enrolled September 14, 2015
AB1535 Amended July 13, 2015
AB1535 Amended June 30, 2015
AB1535 Introduced March 25, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare