|
09/09/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 255, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2016
|
Enrolled measure version corrected.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6053.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2016
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5030.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2016
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2016
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2016
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2016
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3501.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/21/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 21). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/13/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (January 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/07/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/09/2015
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee October 10.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2015
|
Read first time. To print. (Introduced pursuant to Joint Rule 54)
|
|
|