LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1546
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1546
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1546
Compare Versions
AB1546 Chaptered September 9, 2016
AB1546 Enrolled August 23, 2016
AB1546 Amended June 21, 2016
AB1546 Amended April 14, 2016
AB1546 Amended March 29, 2016
AB1546 Amended January 7, 2016
AB1546 Introduced September 9, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB1546 Chaptered September 9, 2016
AB1546 Enrolled August 23, 2016
AB1546 Amended June 21, 2016
AB1546 Amended April 14, 2016
AB1546 Amended March 29, 2016
AB1546 Amended January 7, 2016
AB1546 Introduced September 9, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare