California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1546 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill September 9, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 9, 2016

Amended

Bill June 21, 2016
Bill April 14, 2016
Bill March 29, 2016
Bill January 7, 2016